Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787834

EP2787834 - EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2016/39]
Former [2014/42]For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever Plc.
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / GHOSH DASTIDAR, Sudipta
Hindustan Unilever Ltd.
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN
02 / PANCHANATHAN, Anandh
Hindustan Unilever Ltd.
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN
03 / SHANKAR, Raviprasad
Hindustan Unilever Ltd.
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN
04 / TONPE, Gourinandan, Triumbak
Hindustan Unilever Ltd.
Research Centre
64 Main Road
Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Warner, Guy Jonathan
Unilever PLC
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/39]Warner, Guy Jonathan
Unilver PLC
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2014/42]Wurfbain, Gilles L. , et al
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date12791147.719.11.2012
[2016/39]
WO2012EP72965
Priority number, dateIN2011MUM347709.12.2011         Original published format: IN 3477MU2011
[2017/16]
Former [2014/42]INMM3477201109.12.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083392
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787834
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787834
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23L35/00, A23G9/32, A23G9/50, A21D13/00
[2016/20]
Former International [2014/42]A23G9/50, A23G9/32, A23L1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ESSBARE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2014/42]
English:EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITION[2014/42]
French:COMPOSITION D'ENROBAGE COMESTIBLE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
28.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2016Fee for grant paid
09.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.11.2012
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE19.11.2016
MT19.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/43]HU19.11.2012
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE19.11.2016
MT19.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU19.11.2012
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE19.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
IE19.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9842214  (DALGETY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,29,39,59 *;
 [A]US2008175957  (HORGAN MONIKA BARBARA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 1-14; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1582105  (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [A] 1-12 * example 110 *;
 [AD]US4223023  (FURDA IVAN) [AD] 1-12 * examples 3,4; claims 1,2 *
by applicantEP1618795
 US4223023
 US2007166437