Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809877

EP2809877 - TRAVERSABLE, SEGMENTED WELLBORE OBSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aronstam, Peter S.
5930 Solar Point Lane
Houston, Texas 77041 / US
For all designated states
Fincher, Roger W.
23B Amherst Court
Conroe, Texas 77304 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Acapo AS
P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes
5817 Bergen / NO
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date12791345.729.10.2012
WO2012US62465
Priority number, dateUS201161553474P31.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161553474 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013066825
Date:10.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809877
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:E21B41/00, E21B33/12
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:DURCHQUERBARE SEGMENTIERTE BOHRLOCHVERSTOPFUNGEN[2014/50]
English:TRAVERSABLE, SEGMENTED WELLBORE OBSTRUCTIONS[2014/50]
French:OBSTRUCTIONS DE PUITS DE FORAGE SEGMENTÉES, POUVANT ÊTRE TRAVERSÉES[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase10.10.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/50]
15.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/40]
26.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
10.10.2014Request for further processing filed
10.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.11.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7624821  (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15,18-20 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, lines 37-46 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 6; figures 1-8; claim 1 * [I] 9-10,16-17;
 [X]US2009183883  (FONTENOT JR HUWARD PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-15 * pages 0023-003; figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [X]US6039117  (MUELLER MANFRED W [DE]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 63; figures 1-6; claim 1 *;
 [X]GB2387612  (RUFF PUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 15 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 14; figures 1-3 *