blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2809877 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2809877



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 144
31.08.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
14.08.2017 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
09.08.2017 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
26.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
17.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.02.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.10.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.11.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.11.2014 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.09.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.09.2014 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
02.05.2014 Annex International Searching Authority 2
02.05.2014 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
02.05.2014 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
18.03.2014 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.03.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
13.03.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
29.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
29.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.01.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
10.05.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
08.03.2013 Notification relating to priority claim International Searching Authority 2
08.11.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.11.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.11.2012 Description International Searching Authority 12
08.11.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 9