blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809877


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.09.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.05.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.02.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.10.2016 First examination report
09.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
19.11.2014 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
06.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.10.2014 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
15.10.2014 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
14.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
04.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication