blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2809877
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2809877Global Dossier 10.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161553474 31.10.2011
WO2012US62465 29.10.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013066825Global Dossier 13.03.2014A3
WO2013066825 10.05.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161553474 31.10.2011