Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785649

EP2785649 - DESALINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.11.2017  [2017/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / XIONG, Rihua
General Electic Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
02 / CAI, Wei
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
03 / BARBER, John Harold
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
04 / ELYANOW, Irving David
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
05 / JONES, George Randall
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
06 / ZEPEDA, Juan Alfredo
General Electric Company Global Research
One Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Foster, Christopher Michael , et al
General Electric Technology GmbH
GE Corporate Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Williams, Andrew Richard
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date12791374.709.11.2012
WO2012US64338
Priority number, dateCN2011138503428.11.2011         Original published format: CN201110385034
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081799
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785649
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/469
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:ENTSALZUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2014/41]
English:DESALINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2014/41]
French:SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE DE DESSALEMENT[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
12.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/45]
28.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011210069  (XIONG RIHUA [CN] ET AL) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0046] - [0051]; figure 2 * [I] 2-11,13-20;
 [XI]EP0503589  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [X] 1,12 * figure 3; example 5; claim 1 * [I] 2-11,13-20;
 [A]WO2011130809  (KATHOLIEKE UNIVERSIFEIT LEUVEN [BE]; KALO SINT LIEVEN [BE]; KATHOLIEKE) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008067246  (CH2M HILL INC [US]; MAVIS JAMES D JR [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3619086  (KOCK KLAUS PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *