Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776201

EP2776201 - ARC WELDING APPARATUS WITH A GAS DIFFUSER ; METHOD USING SUCH ARC WELDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/38]GAS DIFFUSER FOR GMAW MANUAL/ROBOTIC ARC WELDING MIG APPARATUS ; ARC WELDING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SUCH GAS DIFFUSOR
[2016/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Victor Equipment Company
2800 Airport Road
Denton, TX 76207 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HASSAN, Khalid
6209 Thoroughbred Trail
Denton, TX 76210 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2014/38]
Application number, filing date12791649.212.11.2012
[2017/01]
WO2012US64694
Priority number, dateUS201161559111P13.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161559111 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013071248
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2776201
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2776201
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/173, B23K9/26, B23K9/29
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM LICHTBOGENSCHWEISSEN MIT EINEM GASDIFFUSOR ; VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN LICHTBOGENSCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG[2016/23]
English:ARC WELDING APPARATUS WITH A GAS DIFFUSER ; METHOD USING SUCH ARC WELDING APPARATUS[2016/23]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE À L'ARC AVEC UN DIFFUSEUR DE GAZ ; PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE A L'ARC UTILISANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF[2016/23]
Former [2014/38]GASDIFFUSOR FÜR MANUELLES/ROBOTISCHES MIG-SCHWEISSGERÄT, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN GASDIFFUSOR
Former [2014/38]GAS DIFFUSER FOR GMAW MANUAL/ROBOTIC ARC WELDING MIG APPARATUS ; ARC WELDING APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SUCH GAS DIFFUSOR
Former [2014/38]DIFFUSEUR DE GAZ POUR MACHINE MIG OU GMAW DE SOUDAGE À L'ARC MANUEL/ROBOTIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ AU DIFFUSEUR DE GAZ
Entry into regional phase28.05.2014National basic fee paid 
28.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
14.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2016Fee for grant paid
10.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2018/33]
Former [2018/14]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT04.01.2017
CZ04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/41]AT04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US3249734  (MEYER GILBERT F) [X] 1,2,5,14,16,17,21,22 * column 4, lines 35-49; figure 5 * [Y] 11-13,15,24 [I] 3,4,6-10,18-20,23;
 [XY]US3265856  (SHELBY CECIL) [X] 1,6,7,10 * column 4, lines 1-8; figure 2 * [Y] 11-13;
 [Y]US3825720  (ZILLINGER A) [Y] 15,24 * abstract *;
 [X]JPS5298646  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,14,17,21,23 * figure - *;
 [X]US3529126  (REEH OLAF) [X] 1,2,5,14,17,21,23 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]US2011036821  (RUEHRNOESSL MANFRED [AT], et al) [A] 14,16 * abstract *;
 [A]US6307179  (WALTERS III JOHN D [US]) [A] 18,22 * abstract *
by applicantUS5491321
 US5338917