Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786638

EP2786638 - LED LAMP WITH HALF WAVE DIMMING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Lighting Solutions, LLC
1975 Noble Road
Bldg. 338
Nela Park
East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / NESER, Morne
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
02 / BACON, Louis
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
03 / NGUYEN, Truong-Khoa
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
04 / POIRIER, Christian
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Picker, Madeline Margaret
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date12791882.922.10.2012
WO2012US61315
Priority number, dateUS201161564662P29.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161564662 P
US20121362389921.09.2012         Original published format: US201213623899
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081741
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786638
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:LED-LAMPE MIT HALBWELLENDÄMMUNG[2014/41]
English:LED LAMP WITH HALF WAVE DIMMING[2014/41]
French:LAMPE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES AVEC ATTÉNUATION À DEMI-ONDE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
20.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011148318  (SHACKLE PETER W [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,2C,2D,3,4A,4B,4C,4D * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0085] * [I] 6-15;
 [XI]US2007182338  (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 11 * * paragraphs [0066] - [0081] * [I] 6-15;
 [XI]US2009184662  (GIVEN TERRY [NZ], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 2,3,4,5a,5b,6a,6b,8-12,15A-15E * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0063] * [I] 6-15;
 [XI]US7759881  (MELANSON JOHN L [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 4-10 * * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 5 * * column 11, lines 39-55; figure 7 * [I] 6-15;
 [A]US4293796  (MCMORROW CLYDE H) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *