Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782682

EP2782682 - A DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A DENTAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DÖNMEZ, Özcan
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Hohmann, Arno
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
Espe Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
Application number, filing date12791940.519.11.2012
[2015/37]
WO2012US65847
Priority number, dateEP2011019000421.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11190004
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078131
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782682
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782682
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B05C17/01
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSGABE EINES ZAHNMATERIALS[2014/40]
English:A DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A DENTAL MATERIAL[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN MATÉRIAU DENTAIRE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
03.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2015Fee for grant paid
27.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2015
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.11.2012
AL09.09.2015
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MK09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU19.11.2012
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MK09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2018/31]HU19.11.2012
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MK09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/39]HU19.11.2012
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
MT09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
SM09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/50]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
FR30.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/45]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
IE19.11.2015
LU19.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU19.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU19.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/31]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
LU19.11.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/28]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/14]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
RS09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT09.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2324792  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0030] , [0036] , [0038] *;
 [A]DE102006037585  (WAGENKNECHT WERKZEUG UND VORRI [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10122961  (SIEMPELKAMP PRESSEN SYSTEME GM [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP1700639
 US6168052