EP2716046 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LINE BUFFER REDUCTION FOR VIDEO PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HFI Innovation Inc. 3F.-7, No.5, Taiyuan 1st St. Zhubei City, Hsinchu County 302 / TW | [2016/45] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No.1, Dusing Road 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUANG, Tzu-Der 5F. No. 50 Zhuangjing 5th St. Zhubei City Hsinchu County Taiwan / TW | 02 /
HUANG, Yu-Wen 8F. No. 23 Ln. 298 Longjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City Taiwan / TW | 03 /
CHEN, Ching-Yeh 4F. No. 809 Sec. 5 Zhongxiao E. Rd. Nangang Dist. Taipei City Taiwan / TW | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12792295.3 | 23.04.2012 | WO2012CN74524 | Priority number, date | US201161490805P | 27.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161490805 P | US201161533895P | 13.09.2011 Original published format: US 201161533895 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012163199 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716046 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/463 (EP,CN,US);
H04N19/00 (KR);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/102 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEITUNGSPUFFERREDUKTION FÜR VIDEOVERARBEITUNGEN | [2014/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LINE BUFFER REDUCTION FOR VIDEO PROCESSING | [2014/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL SERVANT À LA RÉDUCTION D'UNE MÉMOIRE TAMPON DE LIGNE POUR UN TRAITEMENT VIDÉO | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 19.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/40] | Appeal following examination | 20.02.2018 | Appeal received No. T1339/18 | 27.04.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010063184 (MEDIATEK INC [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - ZHAO J ET AL, "Parallel entropy decoding for high-resolution video coding", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2009 - 22-1-2009; SAN JOSE,, (20090120), XP030081714 [X] 1-15 * section 2 * * section 3 * * section 3.3 * * figures 1, 4 * | [XP] - T-D CHUANG ET AL, "CE1.A.3: Reducing line buffers for CABAC", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111107), no. JCTVC-G200, XP030110184 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - LEE T ET AL, "On line buffer removal for CU split flag and skip flag context model", 7. JCT-VC MEETING; 98. MPEG MEETING; 21-11-2011 - 30-11-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20111126), no. JCTVC-G1022, XP030111006 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20060082199 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]CN1980395 (LIANHE XINYUAN DIGIT AUDIO TEC [CN]); | [A]CN101076114 (FUHAN MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101099391 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN [KR]); | [Y]CN101765016 (MEDIATEK INC) |