Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2714207

EP2714207 - X-BRACE AND FLEXIBLE CONNECTION FOR FIRE SPRINKLERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Victaulic Company
4901 Kesslersville Road
Easton, PA 18054 / US
[2014/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIPMAN, Buddy, Clayton
742 Ridge Hollow Drive
Heath, TX 75032 / US
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12793586.425.05.2012
WO2012US39684
Priority number, dateUS201161490737P27.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161490737 P
US201161496347P13.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161496347 P
US20111317683406.07.2011         Original published format: US201113176834
[2014/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012166644
Date:06.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2714207
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.12.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A62C37/14, A62C35/62, A62C35/64, A62C3/00, // A62C37/48
[2015/21]
Former International [2014/15]A62C37/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/15]
TitleGerman:X-STREBE UND FLEXIBLE VERBINDUNG DARAUS FÜR SPRINKLERANLAGEN[2014/15]
English:X-BRACE AND FLEXIBLE CONNECTION FOR FIRE SPRINKLERS[2014/15]
French:ENTRETOISE EN X ET RACCORDEMENT SOUPLE POUR TÊTES D'EXTINCTION[2014/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2014National basic fee paid 
02.01.2014Search fee paid 
02.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
23.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
01.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003075343  (BALLARD ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * figure - *;
 [Y]EP1368589  (VIEREGGE UWE [DE] SALZGITTER MANNESMANN STAHLHAN [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0008] * * figures 4,5,6,7,10,11 *;
 [Y]US2010038099  (THOMPSON ANDREW T [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,5-8,11-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034] *
International search[Y]US2005121206  (DOLAN);
 [Y]US5613563  (JOHNSON);
 [Y]US3911940  (JOHNSON);
 [Y]US2008105440  (JACKSON ET AL);
 [Y]US7516800  (SILVA, JR. ET AL);
 [Y]US5743337  (MACDONALD, III);
 [Y]US4830118  (CAPASSO);
 [A]US2006102362  (S. POLAN);
 [A]US6336510  (GADINI);
 [A]US2004144090  (OGURA ET AL)