blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2715981 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2715981



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1578
02.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
17.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
17.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 161
04.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 161
25.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
25.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 8
25.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.03.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 157
19.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
26.10.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
26.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
26.10.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.10.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
26.10.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
11.05.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 6
22.04.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
13.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
20.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.01.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.12.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
11.10.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 177
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 81
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 157
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 97
03.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
06.12.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 165