Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794344

EP2794344 - UNLOCKING DEVICE FOR LOCKING MEANS OF A SEAT RAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]RELEASE DEVICE FOR THE LOCKING MEANS OF A SEAT RAIL
[2018/31]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adient Luxembourg Holding S.à r.l.
35F, Avenue John F. Kennedy
1855 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/12]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
Adient Luxembourg Holding S.à r.l.
6, rue Eugène Ruppert
2453 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Johnson Controls Components GmbH & Co. KG
Hertelsbrunnenring 2
67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JÄHNER, Falko
5745 Raven Road
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301 / US
02 / RUEß, Georg
Hauptstraße 16
66851 Oberarnbach / DE
03 / KREBS, Jürgen
Kämswiese 12
67806 Rockenhausen / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2014/44]Wolff, Felix , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12794260.521.11.2012
[2019/10]
WO2012EP73258
Priority number, dateDE20111012155720.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011121557
DE2012100606027.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012006060
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092089
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794344
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794344
Date:06.03.2019
Language:DE
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/07, B60N2/06, B60N2/08
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS VERRIEGELUNGSMITTEL EINER SITZSCHIENE[2014/44]
English:UNLOCKING DEVICE FOR LOCKING MEANS OF A SEAT RAIL[2018/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉVERROUILLAGE POUR MOYENS DE VERROUILAGE D'UN RAIL DE SIEGE[2018/31]
Former [2014/44]RELEASE DEVICE FOR THE LOCKING MEANS OF A SEAT RAIL
Former [2014/44]DISPOSITIF DE DÉVERROUILLAGE POUR LE MOYEN DE VERROUILLAGE D'UNE GLISSIÈRE DE SIÈGE
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2019Fee for grant paid
24.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007095762  (INTIER AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]; SZYBISTY ROBERT J [US]; LAPINGCAO EPHRAIM) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028]; figure - *;
 [X]US5806825  (COUASNON CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * abstract *;
 [X]DE2411414  (BERTRAND FAURE PUTEAUX ETS) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * the whole document *