blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2777270 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2777270



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 286
20.07.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.08.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.08.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
18.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
26.01.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.01.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
26.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
26.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 7
22.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 9
03.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 11
03.06.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
21.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.08.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
07.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
16.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 37
31.01.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
31.01.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
31.01.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
06.11.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
06.11.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 5
06.11.2012 Description International Searching Authority 26
06.11.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 4