blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2777270


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.07.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
18.09.2015 Change - divisional application(s) published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
14.08.2015 (Expected) grant published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
11.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.08.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.08.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.07.2015 Change - German title published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - English title published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
09.05.2015 Change - representative
27.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
09.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.02.2015  [2015/07]
29.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Change - inventor published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
10.10.2014 Change - applicant published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Change - representative published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
15.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
13.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication