blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2777270 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280066211 CN201810147654 CN201810147655 CN201810147716 EP12794438 EP15185078 EP15185082 EP17154805 EP18185339



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019075326Global Dossier 07.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
US201514665163 23.03.2015
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201615004174 22.01.2016
US201615187585 20.06.2016
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
US201816178910 02.11.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10142660Global Dossier 27.11.2018B2
US2016309196 20.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
US201514665163 23.03.2015
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201615004174 22.01.2016
US201615187585 20.06.2016
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9654805Global Dossier 16.05.2017B2
US2016295238 06.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
US201514665163 23.03.2015
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201615004174 22.01.2016
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
US201615187604 20.06.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9628826Global Dossier 18.04.2017B2
US2016142735 19.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
US201514665163 23.03.2015
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201615004174 22.01.2016
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9374599Global Dossier 21.06.2016B2
US2014314144 23.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9277240Global Dossier 01.03.2016B2
US2015195568 09.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
US201514665163 23.03.2015
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9001888Global Dossier 07.04.2015B2
US2015010089 08.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
US201414492829 22.09.2014
US201414356799 07.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190006094Global Dossier 16.01.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101940967BGlobal Dossier 21.01.2019B1
KR20180056818 29.05.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101863485BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2018B1
KR20160135849 28.11.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101863423BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2018B1
KR20150055104 20.05.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101680949BGlobal Dossier 29.11.2016B1
KR20140092891 24.07.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6096204BGlobal Dossier 15.03.2017B2
JP2014533029 08.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3490258Global Dossier 29.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
EP12794438 06.11.2012
EP17154805 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3182707Global Dossier 25.07.2018B1
EP3182707 21.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2991351Global Dossier 11.01.2017B1
EP2991351 02.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2981088Global Dossier 08.02.2017B1
EP2981088 03.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108235023Global Dossier 29.06.2018A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
CN201280066211 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108093256Global Dossier 29.05.2018A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
CN201280066211 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108055541Global Dossier 18.05.2018A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
CN201280066211 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104041038BGlobal Dossier 27.03.2018B
CN104041038 10.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2777270Global Dossier 16.09.2015B1
EP2777270 17.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014010839 20.06.2017A8
BR112014010839 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1116899T 05.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1118974T 10.01.2018T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2777270T 12.10.2015T3
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2981088T 10.04.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2991351T 13.03.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3182707T 05.11.2018T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2549066T 22.10.2015T3
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1201395 28.08.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1202200 18.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20151035T 06.11.2015T1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20170345T 21.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185078 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20170491T 02.06.2017T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20181621T 11.01.2019T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP17154805 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN3039CHENP2014 03.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2981088T 31.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL3182707T 28.02.2019T3
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
EP12794438 06.11.2012
EP17154805 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS54254 29.02.2016B1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS55743 31.07.2017B1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185078 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS55834 31.08.2017B1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2609088 30.01.2017C2
RU2014123342 20.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2777270T 30.11.2015T1
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP12794438 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2981088T 26.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185082 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2991351T 26.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP15185078 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI3182707T 30.11.2018T1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
EP17154805 06.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SMT201500241 30.10.2015B
Priority number Date
WO2012FR52552 06.11.2012
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013068684Global Dossier 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019054531Global Dossier 04.04.2019A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2017123668Global Dossier 13.07.2017A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2618070T 20.06.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2621545T 04.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2691540T 27.11.2018T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2982447 10.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1221837 09.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1222070 16.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE025423T 29.02.2016T2
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE031233T 28.06.2017T2
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE033360T 28.11.2017T2
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE040543T 28.03.2019T2
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT2981088T 10.04.2017T
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT2991351T 27.03.2017T
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT3182707T 25.10.2018T
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL2991351T 30.06.2017T3
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2777270E 22.10.2015E
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2981088T 03.04.2017T
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2991351T 03.03.2017T
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2017100690 20.12.2018A
Priority number Date
FR1160109 07.11.2011
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2991351
 EP2981088
 EP3182707