Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777270

EP2777270 - PROCEDURE FOR CODING AND DECODING OF IMAGES, APPARATUS FOR CODING AND DECODING AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/38]METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING IMAGES, ENCODING AND DECODING DEVICE, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMS
[2015/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.08.2016  [2016/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolby International AB
Apollo Building, 3E
Herikerbergweg 1-35
1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL
[2014/46]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Orange
78, rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HENRY, Felix
5 rue de la Galerie
35760 SAINT GREGOIRE / FR
02 / CLARE, Gordon
11 chemin de la Métairie
35740 Pace / FR
 [2014/49]
Former [2014/38]01 / HENRY, Felix
11 square Grande Charbonnière
35700 Rennes / FR
02 / CLARE, Gordon
11 chemin de la Métairie
35740 Pace / FR
Representative(s)Conroy, John , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2015/38]
Former [2014/46]Schley, Jan Malte , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
HighLight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
Application number, filing date12794438.706.11.2012
[2015/38]
WO2012FR52552
Priority number, dateFR2011006010907.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160109
[2014/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013068684
Date:16.05.2013
Language:FR
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777270
Date:17.09.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777270
Date:16.09.2015
Language:FR
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/176, H04N19/147, H04N19/46, H04N19/463, H04N19/91, H04N19/467, H04N19/14, H04N19/44
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/38]H04N7/26
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG VON BILDERN, ANORDNUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG UND ENSTSPRECHENDE COMPUTERPROGRAMME[2015/32]
English:PROCEDURE FOR CODING AND DECODING OF IMAGES, APPARATUS FOR CODING AND DECODING AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMS[2015/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR CORRESPONDANTS[2014/38]
Former [2014/38]VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG VON BILDERN, KODIERUNGS- UND DEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE COMPUTERPROGRAMME
Former [2014/38]METHOD FOR ENCODING AND DECODING IMAGES, ENCODING AND DECODING DEVICE, AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAMS
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014National basic fee paid 
03.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2015Fee for grant paid
07.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15185078.1  / EP2991351
EP15185082.3  / EP2981088
EP17154805.0  / EP3182707
EP18185339.1
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]  - SUNG MIN KIM ET AL, Data Hiding on H.264/AVC Compressed Video, IMAGE ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 698 - 707, (20070822), ISBN 978-3-540-74258-6, XP019097872 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - XIAOJING MA ET AL, "A Data Hiding Algorithm for H.264/AVC Video Streams Without Intra-Frame Distortion Drift", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101001), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1320 - 1330, XP011317382 [X] 1-4,6-10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 5,11
 [XA]  - HADAR O ET AL, "Rate distortion optimization for efficient watermarking in the DCT domain", BROADBAND MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND BROADCASTING, 2008 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080331), ISBN 978-1-4244-1648-6, pages 1 - 8, XP031268612 [X] 1,4,6,7,10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5,8,9,11
 [A]  - QIMING LI ET AL, A Reversible Data Hiding Scheme for JPEG Images, ADVANCES IN MULTIMEDIA INFORMATION PROCESSING - PCM 2010, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 653 - 664, (20100921), ISBN 978-3-642-15701-1, XP019151677 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - JEAN-MARC THIESSE ET AL, "Rate Distortion Data Hiding of Motion Vector Competition Information in Chroma and Luma Samples for Video Compression", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110601), vol. 21, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2011.2130330, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 729 - 741, XP011325921 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2011.2130330
 [A]  - PARUCHURI J K ET AL, "Joint optimization of data hiding and video compression", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2008. ISCAS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080518), ISBN 978-1-4244-1683-7, pages 3021 - 3024, XP031392649 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicant   - J.-M. THIESSE; J. JUNG; M. ANTONINI, "Data Hiding of Motion Information in Chroma and Luma Samples for Video Compression", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, (2011),