Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2780767

EP2780767 - ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE AND A DATA DEVICE; METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION CONNECTION BETWEEN THE ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE AND THE DATA DEVICE; AND A CORRESPONDING FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Langejürgen, Stefan
Hollenhagen 81
32602 Vlotho / DE
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2014/39]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date12794673.915.11.2012
[2019/10]
WO2012EP72773
Priority number, dateDE2011105536215.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011055362
[2014/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013072431
Date:23.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2780767
Date:24.09.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2780767
Date:06.03.2019
Language:DE
[2019/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A47C31/00, G05B15/02, G05B19/042
[2018/29]
Former International [2014/39]G05B19/042, A61G7/018
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG MIT EINEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB UND EINEM DATENGERÄT; VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN DEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB UND DEM DATENGERÄT; UND EIN ENTSPRECHENDER MÖBELANTRIEB[2014/39]
English:ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE AND A DATA DEVICE; METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION CONNECTION BETWEEN THE ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE AND THE DATA DEVICE; AND A CORRESPONDING FURNITURE DRIVE[2014/39]
French:SYSTÈME COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR MEUBLES ET UN APPAREIL INFORMATIQUE ; PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ÉTABLIR UNE CONNEXION DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE LE DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR MEUBLES ET L'APPAREIL INFORMATIQUE ; ET UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLES[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2019Fee for grant paid
21.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2008092292  (RAWLS-MEEHAN MARTIN B [US]) [Y] 1-8,12,15-21,23,24 * paragraph [0142]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0246] *;
 [Y]US2005256939  (NAISMITH RONALD H [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,12,15-21,23,24 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102006051014  (ENDRESS & HAUSER WETZER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0434986  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-24 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 53; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2003044068  (KAGEHIRO TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *
by applicantDE19603318