Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2781021

EP2781021 - SPURIOUS-MODE SUPPRESSION PIEZOELECTRIC RESONATOR DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Sang-June
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / KIM, Jonghae
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12795225.715.11.2012
WO2012US65366
Priority number, dateUS20111329683115.11.2011         Original published format: US201113296831
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013074848
Date:23.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2781021
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2013
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/02, H03H9/05
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/39]
TitleGerman:ENTWURF EINES PIEZOELEKTRISCHEN RESONATORS MIT UNTERDRÜCKUNG UNECHTER MODALITÄTEN[2014/39]
English:SPURIOUS-MODE SUPPRESSION PIEZOELECTRIC RESONATOR DESIGN[2014/39]
French:CONCEPTION DE RÉSONATEUR PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE DE SUPPRESSION DE MODE FRAUDULEUX[2014/39]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
23.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2008079515  (AYAZI FARROKH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,12-14,16-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0029]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 4a-4f * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0050]; figures 5-7 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 20-22 [I] 2,6-11,15,19
 [XAI]  - HARRINGTON B P ET AL, "Toward ultimate performance in GHZ MEMS resonators: Low impedance and high Q", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS), 2010 IEEE 23RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100124), ISBN 978-1-4244-5761-8, pages 707 - 710, XP031655030 [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [A] 20-22 [I] 2-13,15-19
 [XAI]  - GIANLUCA PIAZZA ET AL, "Piezoelectric Aluminum Nitride Vibrating Contour-Mode MEMS Resonators", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (20061201), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2006.886012, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 1406 - 1418, XP011151359 [X] 1,12-14,20 * page 1406, column l - page 1408, column l; figures 1,2 * * page 1409, column r * * page 1410, column r - page 1411, column l; figures 6,8 * * page 1414, column r - page 1416, column r; figures 14-16 * [A] 21,22 [I] 2-11,15-19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2006.886012
 [XA]  - ROY H OLSSON ET AL, "Origins and mitigation of spurious modes in aluminum nitride microresonators", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM (IUS), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, (20101011), doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2010.5935667, ISBN 978-1-4577-0382-9, pages 1272 - 1276, XP031952803 [X] 21,22 * the whole document * [A] 1-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2010.5935667
 [XA]  - WOJCIECHOWSKI K E ET AL, "Super high frequency width extensional aluminum nitride (AlN) MEMS resonators", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM (IUS), 2009 IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090920), ISBN 978-1-4244-4389-5, pages 1179 - 1182, XP031654708 [X] 21,22 * the whole document * [A] 1-20