Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782491

EP2782491 - ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZED VISUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / BENNING, Christopher
14 Downey Street
Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US
02 / AQUILINO, Paul
10 Wildwood Lane
Walpole, MA 07071 / US
03 / HUTCHINS, John
317 High Street
North Attleboro, MA 01890 / US
04 / TUPPER, Scott
44 Lee Circle
Pascoag, RI 02859 / US
 [2015/08]
Former [2014/40]01 / BENNING, Christopher
600 West Main Street
Ellettsville, IN 47429 / US
02 / AQUILINO, Paul
10 Wildwood Lane
Walpole, MA 07071 / US
03 / HUTCHINS, John
317 High Street
North Attleboro, MA 01890 / US
04 / TUPPER, Scott
44 Lee Circle
Pascoag, RI 02859 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/13]
Former [2014/40]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12795288.520.11.2012
[2019/13]
WO2012US66143
Priority number, dateUS201161562142P21.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161562142 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078246
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782491
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782491
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/07, A61B1/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDOSKOPISCHES SYSTEM FÜR OPTIMIERTE VISUALISIERUNG[2014/40]
English:ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZED VISUALIZATION[2014/40]
French:SYSTÈME ENDOSCOPIQUE POUR VISUALISATION OPTIMISÉE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
01.10.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2019Fee for grant paid
18.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19161842.0  / EP3517018
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES27.03.2019
FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
[2019/47]
Former [2019/46]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
IT27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI27.03.2019
HR27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
LV27.03.2019
NL27.03.2019
RS27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
BG27.06.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
GR28.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
SE27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.03.2019
LT27.03.2019
NO27.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP1955642  (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,8-14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7,15;
 [XY]WO2005094665  (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * figure 28 * * page 34, line 23 - page 35, line 27 * [Y] 6;
 [Y]US2010188493  (KANZAKI KAZUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 5-7,15 * paragraph [0144] * * figures 20-21 *
ExaminationWO2010129324
 US2007066869