Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782738

EP2782738 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TOOTHBRUSH HANDLE HAVING AN INNER CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / WEN, Li
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / BIRK, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
04 / BRESSELSCHMIDT, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / HORTON, Andrew, Joseph
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
06 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
07 / HUSTEDT, Siegfried, Kurt Martin
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
08 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
09 / KAWERAU, Jochen
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
10 / NEUFARTH, Ralph, Edwin
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
11 / PFEIFER, Ulrich
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
12 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
13 / REICK, Hansjoerg
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
14 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
15 / SCHMELCHER, Heidrun, Annika
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
16 / SCHMID, Franziska
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
17 / STOERKEL, Jens, Uwe
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
18 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
19 / WEST, George
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
20 / WINKLER, Tilmann
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
21 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
 [2016/03]
Former [2015/49]01 / WEN, Cathy
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / BIRK, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
04 / BRESSELSCHMIDT, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / HORTON, Andrew, Joseph
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
06 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
07 / HUSTEDT, Siegfried, Kurt Martin
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
08 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
09 / KAWERAU, Jochen
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
10 / NEUFARTH, Ralph, Edwin
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
11 / PFEIFER, Ulrich
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
12 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
13 / REICK, Hansjoerg
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
14 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
15 / SCHMELCHER, Heidrun, Annika
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
16 / SCHMID, Franziska
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
17 / STOERKEL, Jens, Uwe
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
18 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
19 / WEST, George
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
20 / WINKLER, Tilmann
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
21 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Former [2015/48]01 / WEN, Li
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / BIRK, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
04 / BRESSELSCHMIDT, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / HORTON, Andrew, Joseph
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
06 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
07 / HUSTEDT, Siegfried, Kurt Martin
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
08 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
09 / KAWERAU, Jochen
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
10 / NEUFARTH, Ralph, Edwin
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
11 / PFEIFER, Ulrich
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
12 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
13 / REICK, Hansjoerg
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
14 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
15 / SCHMELCHER, Heidrun, Annika
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
16 / SCHMID, Franziska
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
17 / STOERKEL, Jens, Uwe
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
18 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
19 / WEST, George
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
20 / WINKLER, Tilmann
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
21 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Former [2014/40]01 / WEN, Cathy
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / BIRK, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
04 / BRESSELSCHMIDT, Andreas
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
05 / HORTON, Andrew, Joseph
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
06 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
07 / HUSTEDT, Siegfried, Kurt Martin
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
08 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
09 / KAWERAU, Jochen
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
10 / NEUFARTH, Ralph, Edwin
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
11 / PFEIFER, Ulrich
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
12 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
13 / REICK, Hansjoerg
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
14 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
15 / SCHMELCHER, Heidrun, Annika
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
16 / SCHMID, Franziska
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
17 / STOERKEL, Jens, Uwe
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
18 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
19 / WEST, George
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
20 / WINKLER, Tilmann
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
21 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Representative(s)Schneider, Stefan Michael
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/38]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2014/43]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Frankfurter Str. 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Former [2014/40]Töpert, Verena Clarita , et al
Braun GmbH
Patent Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date12795292.721.11.2012
[2018/38]
WO2012US66320
Priority number, dateUS201161562675P22.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161562675 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013078357
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2782738
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782738
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C49/02, B29C49/24, B29C49/48, // B29C49/20, B29C49/36, A46B5/02, A46D3/00
[2018/19]
Former International [2014/40]B29C49/02, B29C49/24, B29C49/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZAHNBÜRSTENGRIFFS MIT EINEM INNENHOHLRAUM[2014/40]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TOOTHBRUSH HANDLE HAVING AN INNER CAVITY[2014/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN MANCHE POUR BROSSE À DENTS POURVU D'UNE CAVITÉ INTERNE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2014National basic fee paid 
14.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
08.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2018Fee for grant paid
10.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2018
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE21.11.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
IE21.11.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2005036821  (PFENNIGER ADRIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0033] , [0039] , [0049] - [0052] - [0057]; figures 1-7,9 * [Y] 2,8-11 [I] 3;
 [I]US2007231052  (LATOUR RAH-ZAH [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-7,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0021] , [0028] - [0030]; figure 1; claims 1,3,4 *;
 [Y]WO02085602  (ISPA INC [US]) [Y] 2,8,11 * claims 1,2,4,6,7 *;
 [Y]WO02098630  (MERIDIAN AUTOMOTIVE SYS INC [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * claims 1,4,7,8,22,23 *;
 [I]DE102005036301  (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [I] 1,12 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US5804127  (TAKATORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,8-11 * figures 1,3; claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 42 * * column 12, lines 17-22 *;
 [Y]EP1547939  (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0016] *;
 [Y]US5350483  (YAGER JOSEPH C [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * figures 12,14,15 * * column 5, lines 30-46 * * column 9, lines 41-49 * * column 14, lines 10-55 *;
 [Y]GB2312215  (SEGAL SHEEMA [GB], et al) [Y] 2,11 * page 2, lines 14-17 * * page 3, lines 25-34 * * page 4, lines 12-28 *
by applicantUS5845358
 US6276019
 EP0668140
 EP0721832
 US6818174
 WO2004077996
 EP1559529
 EP1559530