Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2782738


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2020 [2020/03]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
26.07.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
28.08.2018 Change - representative
17.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
14.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.08.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2018 Change - classification published on  09.05.2018  [2018/19]
06.04.2018 Change - classification published on  09.05.2018  [2018/19]
15.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2015 Change - inventor published on  20.01.2016  [2016/03]
10.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 Change - inventor published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
23.10.2015 Change - inventor published on  25.11.2015  [2015/48]
23.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
13.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
12.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 Change - representative published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Change - representative published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.11.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication