Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782739

EP2782739 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TOOTHBRUSH HAVING AN INNER CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2018/41]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / WEN, Li
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
04 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
05 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
06 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
08 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
 [2016/03]
Former [2015/49]01 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / WEN, Cathy
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
04 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
05 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
06 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
08 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Former [2015/48]01 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / WEN, Li
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
04 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
05 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
06 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
08 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Former [2014/40]01 / NEWMAN, Matthew, Lloyd
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
02 / WEN, Cathy
8700 Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, Ohio 45040-9462 / US
03 / HOUGHTON, Stephen, Alan
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
04 / JACKSON, Scott
11988 Tramway Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US
05 / PHILLIPS, Bradley, John
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
06 / SATTERFIELD, Richard, Darren
8611 Beckett Road
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
07 / UHE, Andrew, M.
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
08 / RYAN, Christopher, Thomas
495 Blackburn Road
Mount Waverly, Victoria 3149 / AU
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Schneider, Stefan Michael
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2014/40]Joos, Uta Susanne
P&G Service GmbH
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date12795294.321.11.2012
[2018/41]
WO2012US66322
Priority number, dateUS201161562675P22.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161562675 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013078359
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2782739
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782739
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C49/04, B29C49/20, A46D3/04, B29C49/22, B29C49/24, B29C49/36, B29C49/38, B29C49/48, A46B5/02
[2018/22]
Former International [2014/40]B29C49/04, B29C49/20, A46B5/02, A46D3/04, B29C49/22, B29C49/24, B29C49/36, B29C49/38, B29C49/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT EINEM INNENHOHLRAUM[2014/40]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TOOTHBRUSH HAVING AN INNER CAVITY[2014/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE BROSSE À DENTS POURVUE D'UNE CAVITÉ INTERNE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
08.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2018Fee for grant paid
29.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2018
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
LU21.11.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL10.10.2018
AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005036821  (PFENNIGER ADRIAN [CH], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0013] , [0033] , [0039] , [0049] - [0052] - [0057]; figures 1-7,9 * [Y] 1-12;
 [Y]JPH1016037  (UCHIYAMA IPPEI) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5804127  (TAKATORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11 * figures 1,3; claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 42 * * column 12, lines 17-22 *;
 [Y]EP1547939  (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0016] *;
 [Y]DE102005036301  (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0016] , [0025] - [0029]; figures 1-5 *
by applicantUS5845358
 US6276019
 EP0668140
 EP0721832
 US6818174
 WO2004077996
 EP1559529
 EP1559530
 US2007251040
 US2004154112
 US2006272112
 US6553604
 US6151745
 US6058541
 US5268005
 US5313909
 US4802255
 US6018840
 US5836769
 US5722106
 US6475553
 US2006080794