Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786498

EP2786498 - LOW-COMPLEXITY DECODER FOR CONVOLUTIONAL ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]LOW-COMPLEXITY ENCODER FOR CONVOLUTIONAL ENCODING
[2017/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Safran Electronics & Defense
18/20 quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2018/03]
Former [2016/34]For all designated states
Safran Electronics & Defense
18/20, quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE
18-20 Quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHIODINI, Alain
SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE
18-20 Quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
02 / GILLET, Michel
SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE
18-20 Quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
87 rue de Sèze
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2018/03]
Former [2014/41]Regimbeau
139, rue Vendôme
69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date12795409.728.11.2012
[2018/03]
WO2012EP73853
Priority number, dateFR2011006092529.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160925
[2014/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079540
Date:06.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786498
Date:08.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786498
Date:17.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/29, H03M13/37, H03M13/39
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEKODIERER MIT GERINGER KOMPLEXITÄT FÜR FALTUNGSKODIERUNG[2017/36]
English:LOW-COMPLEXITY DECODER FOR CONVOLUTIONAL ENCODING[2017/36]
French:DECODEUR DE FAIBLE COMPLEXITE POUR CODAGE CONVOLUTIF[2014/41]
Former [2014/41]KODIERER MIT GERINGER KOMPLEXITÄT FALTUNGSKODIERUNG
Former [2014/41]LOW-COMPLEXITY ENCODER FOR CONVOLUTIONAL ENCODING
Entry into regional phase13.06.2014National basic fee paid 
13.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
05.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2017Fee for grant paid
05.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2017
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/43]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2011209029  (ZOPF ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; figure 6; claims 1-8 * [A] 2-8,11;
 [A]FR2765749  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *