Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2863750

EP2863750 - ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
100 Victoria Embankment
London, EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2016/17]
Former [2015/18]For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
100 Victoria Embankment
London, EC4Y 0DY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CORNMELL, Robert, Joseph
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
02 / DIEHL, Megan, Anne
24 Maple Avenue
Line Lexington, PA 18932 / US
03 / GOLDING, Stephen
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
04 / HARP, John, Robert
5000 Western Ave., 1404
Knoxville, TN 37921 / US
05 / STOTT, Ian, Peter
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
06 / THOMPSON, Katherine, Mary
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight
Quarry Road East
Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
07 / TRUSLOW, Carol, Lynn
90 Grand View Road
Easton, PA 18042 / US
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]van den Brom, Coenraad Richard
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2015/18]Corsten, Michael Allan
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date12795440.205.12.2012
[2016/17]
WO2012EP74404
Priority number, dateUS201161567355P06.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567355 P
EP2012017384127.06.2012         Original published format: EP 12173841
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083583
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863750
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2863750
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01P1/00, A01N31/08, A01N31/06, A01N31/04, A61K8/34, A61K31/05
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
TitleGerman:ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2015/18]
English:ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITION[2015/18]
French:COMPOSITION ANTIMICROBIENNE[2015/18]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.05.2014Examination requested  [2015/18]
21.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2016Fee for grant paid
07.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.12.2012
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU05.12.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU05.12.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
MT05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU05.12.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU05.12.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE05.12.2016
LU05.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/47]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2010046238  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [ID] 1-11 * claims 1-14; table 1 *;
 [I]FR2697133  (TRANSBIOTECH [FR], et al) [I] 1-11 * pages 5,6,8; claims 2,5,6,13; tables 1,2 *
by applicantWO2010046238
 WO2011117424
 WO2004035723
 FR2697133
 WO2004006876
    - P A GODDARD; K A MCCUE, Disinfection, Sterilisation and Preservation, LIPPINCOTT, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, (2001), pages 255 - 282
    - JP VOETS ET AL., J. APPL. BACT., (1976), vol. 40, pages 67 - 72
    - J JENSEN, "Chlorophenols in the terrestrial environment", REVIEWS OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONTAMINATION AND TOXICOLOGY, (1996), vol. 146, pages 25 - 51
    - A.K. GHOSE; V.N. VISWANADHAN; J.J. WENDOLOSKI, J.PHYS.CHEM. A, (1998), vol. 102, page 3762
    - A L GUNATILAKA, Natural products in Plants: Chemical Diversity in the Wiley Encyclopedia of Chemical Biology, pages 1 - 17
    - E BREITMAIER, Terpenes: flavors, fragrances, pharmaca, pheromones, WILEY-VCH, (2006), page 17
    - F HEUSLER, The Chemistry of the Terpenes, P BLAKISTONS'S SON & CO, (1902), page 21
    - SCHWARTZ; PERRY, Surface Active Agents, INTERSCIENCE, (1949), vol. 1
    - SCHWARTZ; PERRY; BERCH, SURFACE ACTIVE AGENTS, INTERSCIENCE, (1958), vol. 2
    - McCutcheon's Emulsifiers and Detergents, MANUFACTURING CONFECTIONERS COMPANY
    - JRW LAMBERT; R LAMBERT, J. APPL. MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 95, page 734
    - T. JADAVJI; CG PROBER; R CHEUNG, ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1984), vol. 26, page 91