Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785268

EP2785268 - ROBOTIC-ASSISTED DEVICE FOR POSITIONING A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT RELATIVE TO THE BODY OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtech
Parc de Bellegarde - Bât A
1 Chemin de Borie
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/20]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Medtech
Parc de Bellegarde - Bât A
1 Chemin de Borie
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MAILLET, Pierre
7, rue Georges Sand
34130 SAINT-AUNES / FR
02 / NAHUM, Bertin
3 allée Servan
Domaine du Golf
34670 Baillargues / FR
03 / BADANO, Fernand
4 Allée Marcel Achard
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / DEHOUR, Patrick
Chemin des Carrièrasses
30260 Crespian / FR
 [2018/20]
Former [2014/46]01 / MAILLET, Pierre
Résidence le Rhodes
440 rue esculape
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
02 / NAHUM, Bertin
3 allée Servan
Domaine du Golf
34670 Baillargues / FR
03 / BADANO, Fernand
4 Allée Marcel Achard
F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / DEHOUR, Patrick
Chemin des Carrièrasses
F-30260 Crespian / FR
Former [2014/41]01 / MAILLET, Pierre
Résidence le Rhodes
440 rue esculape
F-34090 Montpellier / FR
02 / NAHUM, Bertin
500 East 77th Street
Apt 703
F-NY 10162 New York / FR
03 / BADANO, Fernand
4 Allée Marcel Achard
F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / DEHOUR, Patrick
Chemin des Carrièrasses
F-30260 Crespian / FR
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/20]
Former [2014/41]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
Application number, filing date12795507.808.11.2012
[2018/20]
WO2012FR52582
Priority number, dateFR2011006097430.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160974
[2014/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079843
Date:06.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785268
Date:08.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785268
Date:16.05.2018
Language:FR
[2018/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00, A61B34/30
[2017/47]
Former International [2014/41]A61B19/00, A61B17/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBOTERUNTERSTÜTZTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES CHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS AM KÖRPER EINES PATIENTEN[2014/41]
English:ROBOTIC-ASSISTED DEVICE FOR POSITIONING A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT RELATIVE TO THE BODY OF A PATIENT[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF ASSISTÉ PAR ROBOTIQUE DE POSITIONNEMENT D'INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL PAR RAPPORT AU CORPS D'UN PATIENT.[2017/51]
Former [2014/41]DISPOSITIF ASSISTE PAR ROBOTIQUE DE POSITIONNEMENT D'INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL PAR RAPPORT AU CORPS D'UN PATIENT.
Entry into regional phase04.06.2014National basic fee paid 
04.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
19.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2018Fee for grant paid
06.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18171878.4  / EP3378431
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2017
Opposition(s)19.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
LU08.11.2018
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
MC16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SI16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
IT16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
SM16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT16.05.2018
CZ16.05.2018
DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
PL16.05.2018
RO16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
SK16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK16.05.2018
EE16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK16.05.2018
ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
NL16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
GR17.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
LV16.05.2018
RS16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
HR16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
SE16.05.2018
BG16.08.2018
NO16.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES16.05.2018
FI16.05.2018
LT16.05.2018
NO16.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007002926  (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068]; figures 1-3, 6, 7,9 *;
 [X]DE102008022924  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2006142657  (QUAID ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * paragraphs [0111] - [0149]; figures 1,2,8 *;
 [X]US2008033410  (RASTEGAR JAHANGIR S [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 82]; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO2007002926
 DE102008022924
 US2006142657
 US2008033410
by applicantUS2006142657
 WO2007002926
 DE102008022924
 US2008033410
 FR2917598