Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782514

EP2782514 - TISSUE AND STONE REMOVAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / ZERFAS, Jeffrey, W.
2700 S. McMillan Court
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
02 / GARDNER, Troy
10899 Wilmington Drive
Carmel, IN 46033 / US
03 / GREEN, Christopher, W.
607 West Slate Drive
Apartment A
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
04 / SMITH, Jeffrey, C.
9801 Buckskin Road
Poland, IN 47868 / US
05 / OSKIN, Christopher, L.
34 Barbara Jean Street
Grafton, MA 01519 / US
06 / DAIGNAULT, Kenneth J.
50 Winfield Road
Holden, MA 01520 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2016/51]
Former [2014/40]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12795716.521.11.2012
[2016/51]
WO2012US66382
Priority number, dateUS201161563167P23.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563167 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013078402
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2782514
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782514
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/22
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWEBE- UND STEINBESEITIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/40]
English:TISSUE AND STONE REMOVAL DEVICE[2014/40]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION DE TISSU ET DE CALCULS[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
28.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2016Fee for grant paid
24.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.08.2015
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU21.11.2012
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/33]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9106271  (DODICK JACK MURRAY [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10,12 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 3; figures 2,3; claims 1,5,9 * [I] 8;
 [X]US6090103  (HAKKY SAID I [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,11,12 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,4 *;
 [X]US5300087  (KNOEPFLER DENNIS J [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,12 * column 1, line 60 - column 6, line 16; figures 2,5 *;
 [X]US2002123744  (REYNARD MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0053] - [0054]; figures 8-11 *;
 [X]US7104983  (GRASSO MICHAEL [US] ET AL GRASSO III MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,9,11,12 * column 2, lines 33-53 * * column 5, line 56 - column 8, line 63 * * column 11, lines 18-25; figures 2F,4,10B *;
 [XI]WO9632895  (COHERENT INC [US]; MANOUKIAN NUBAR [US]; SOLTIS TIM [US]; HMELAR MICHA) [X] 1,4,9,10,12 * page 4, lines 19-33; figure 8B * * page 16, lines 8-23 * [I] 2,3;
 [X]US5470320  (TIEFENBRUN JONATHAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9,11,12 * figures 5,6; claims 1,15,36 *;
 [X]US5304124  (ESSIG MITCHELL N [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,9,12 * column 4, lines 25-35; figure 6; claims 2-4 *;
 [XI]US5085658  (MEYER WILLIAM F [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12 * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 14; figures 3,10 * [I] 2,3;
 [XI]US6152919  (HAKKY SAID I [US]) [X] 1,4,9,11,12 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 7; figures 1,3 * [I] 2,3