Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783505

EP2783505 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, LOCATION INFORMATION ADDING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KANEDA, Yuichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Königstrasse 5
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12795868.423.10.2012
WO2012JP06783
Priority number, dateJP2011025384021.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011253840
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013099075
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783505
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32, H04N101/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM HINZUFÜGEN VON STANDORTINFORMATIONEN UND PROGRAMM[2014/40]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, LOCATION INFORMATION ADDING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/40]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ D'AJOUT D'INFORMATIONS D'EMPLACEMENT, ET PROGRAMME[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2014National basic fee paid 
08.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
08.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/46]
06.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/46]
25.06.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP1879373  (RICOH KK [JP]) [I] 1-3,6-8,10,11,19,20 * paragraphs [0018] - [0044] * [Y] 4,5,9,12-18;
 [XYI]JP2011124812  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,19,20 * paragraphs [0019] , [0029] - [0034] - [0049] - [0066] * [Y] 4,5,9,12-18 [I] 6,8;
 [Y]EP1998260  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 4,5,12-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0018] , [0019] , [0029] - [0042] *;
 [Y]US2011164148  (AKIYOSHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0075] , [0084] , [0089] , [0169]; figures 3,4,11,12A *;
 [Y]US6657666  (IMAGAWA SEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 14-17 * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 64 *;
 [Y]EP2157777  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 9 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2006157810  (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 18 * abstract *
 [Y]  - KENTARO TOYAMA ET AL, "Geographical Location Tags on Digital Images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 11TH. ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA. MM'03. BERKELEY, CA, NOV. 2 - 8, 2003; [ACM INTERNATIONAL MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20031102), vol. CONF. 11, ISBN 978-1-58113-722-4, pages 1 - 12, XP002420408 [Y] 18 * page 7, column r - page 8, column l *
by applicantJP2005005953