Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2776985

EP2776985 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UNSUPERVISED NEURAL REPLAY, LEARNING REFINEMENT, ASSOCIATION AND MEMORY TRANSFER: NEURAL COMPONENT MEMORY TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2018  [2018/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HUNZINGER, Jason Frank
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / CHAN, Victor Hokkiu
5775Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12795947.609.11.2012
WO2012US64517
Priority number, dateUS20111329217509.11.2011         Original published format: US201113292175
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013071160
Date:16.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2776985
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2013
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/04, G06N3/08
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR UNÜBERWACHTE NEURONALE WIEDERGABE, LERNVERFEINERUNG, ASSOZIATION UND GEDÄCHTNISTRANSFER: GEDÄCHTNISTRANSFER NEURONALER KOMPONENTEN[2014/38]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR UNSUPERVISED NEURAL REPLAY, LEARNING REFINEMENT, ASSOCIATION AND MEMORY TRANSFER: NEURAL COMPONENT MEMORY TRANSFER[2014/38]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR UNE REPRÉSENTATION NEURONALE NON SUPERVISÉE, UN RAFFINEMENT D'APPRENTISSAGE, UNE ASSOCIATION ET UN TRANSFERT DE MÉMOIRE : TRANSFERT DE MÉMOIRE DE COMPOSANTS NEURONAUX[2014/38]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
16.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/18]
20.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/18]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US7089218  (VISEL THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1-55 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 27, paragraph 1 *;
 [XI]  - PANAYIOTA POIRAZI ET AL, "Impact of Active Dendrites and Structural Plasticity on the Memory Capacity of Neural Tissue", NEURON, (20010301), vol. 29, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0896-6273(01)00252-5, ISSN 0896-6273, pages 779 - 796, XP055055318 [X] 1,19,37,55 * page 779 - page 794, column l, paragraph 1 * [I] 2-18,20-36,38-54

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(01)00252-5
 [A]  - ROBERT C. FROEMKE ET AL, "Dendritic synapse location and neocortical spike-timing-dependent plasticity", FRONTIERS IN SYNAPTIC NEUROSCIENCE, (20100721), vol. 2, doi:10.3389/fnsyn.2010.00029, pages 1 - 14, XP055055332 [A] 1-55 * page 1 - page 11, column r, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnsyn.2010.00029
 [A]  - KNOBLAUCH ANDREAS, "Structural plasticity, cortical memory, and the spacing effect", BMC NEUROSCIENCE, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20090713), vol. 10, no. Suppl 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2202-10-S1-O16, ISSN 1471-2202, page O16, XP021056533 [A] 1-55 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2202-10-S1-O16