Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785265

EP2785265 - DEVICE FOR DETACHING PARIETAL THROMBI FROM A BLOOD VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universitätsklinikum Freiburg
Stefan-Meier-Strasse 8
79104 Freiburg / DE
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HEHRLEIN, Christoph
Wintererstr. 7
79104 Freiburg / DE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Rösler, Uwe
Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei
Landsberger Strasse 480a
81241 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12797694.212.11.2012
[2015/39]
WO2012EP04694
Priority number, dateDE20111012000430.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011120004
[2014/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079156
Date:06.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785265
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785265
Date:23.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/3207, A61B17/22, A61B17/221, A61M25/00, A61M25/10
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABLÖSEN WANDSTÄNDIGER THROMBEN AUS EINEM KÖRPERGEFÄSS[2014/41]
English:DEVICE FOR DETACHING PARIETAL THROMBI FROM A BLOOD VESSEL[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR RETIRER DES THROMBUS PARIÉTAUX D'UN VAISSEAU DU CORPS[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2014National basic fee paid 
26.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
09.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
11.08.2015Fee for grant paid
11.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2015
Opposition(s)24.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2012
AL23.09.2015
BG23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
MK23.09.2015
MT23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
SM23.09.2015
TR23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU12.11.2012
BG23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
MK23.09.2015
MT23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
SM23.09.2015
TR23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2018/31]HU12.11.2012
BG23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
MK23.09.2015
MT23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
SM23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2017/39]HU12.11.2012
BG23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
MT23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
SM23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/49]DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/45]DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/39]DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/31]EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/28]EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/24]EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/23]EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
Former [2016/22]EE23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
Former [2016/10]FI23.09.2015
HR23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
RS23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT23.09.2015
NO23.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT23.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010115642  (ACANDIS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 11, paragraph 8 - page 18, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2005021071  (KONSTANTINO EITAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0119]; figures 1-27 *;
 [A]US2005283166  (GREENHALGH E S [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-21 *;
 [A]EP0385920  (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 36; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]WO2007089897  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 12 - page 23, line 2; figures 1-8 *
by applicantUS2010087844
 US2006074441
 US2011040314
 US2006064073
 US2006253145
 US2007208361
 US2009270800
 WO2010132748
 US2008300532
 DE102009017050
 US2010125239
 US7063671