Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788574

EP2788574 - METHOD FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCE OF A DRILL BIT CONFIGURATION, AND FOR COMPARING THE PERFORMANCE OF DIFFERENT DRILL BIT CONFIGURATIONS FOR DRILLING SIMILAR ROCK FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.12.2016  [2016/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BETSCH, Laetitia
c/o HALLIBURTON DRILL BITS AND SERVICES
Eldfiskvegen 1
N-4056 Tananger / NO
02 / JOHANSEN, Oskar
Kokstaddalen 27
N-5257 Kokstad / NO
03 / BOUTOT, Franck
Halliburton House
Howemoss Crescent
Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB21 0GN / GB
 [2015/40]
Former [2014/42]01 / LEWIS, Laetitia
c/o HALLIBURTON DRILL BITS AND SERVICES
Eldfiskvegen 1
N-4056 Tananger / NO
02 / JOHANSEN, Oskar
Kokstaddalen 27
N-5257 Kokstad / NO
03 / BOUTOT, Franck
Halliburton House
Howemoss Crescent
Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB21 0GN / GB
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12797772.615.11.2012
WO2012EP72710
Priority number, dateGB2011002091605.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201120916
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013083380
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2788574
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/00, E21B41/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT EINER BOHRMEISSELKONFIGURATION UND ZUM VERGLEICHEN DER LEISTUNG VON VERSCHIEDENEN BOHRMEISSELKONFIGURATIONEN ZUM BOHREN IN ÄHNLICHEN GESTEINSFORMATIONEN[2014/42]
English:METHOD FOR ASSESSING THE PERFORMANCE OF A DRILL BIT CONFIGURATION, AND FOR COMPARING THE PERFORMANCE OF DIFFERENT DRILL BIT CONFIGURATIONS FOR DRILLING SIMILAR ROCK FORMATIONS[2014/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE LA PERFORMANCE D'UNE CONFIGURATION DE TRÉPAN ET DE COMPARAISON DE LA PERFORMANCE DE DIFFÉRENTES CONFIGURATIONS DE TRÉPAN POUR LE FORAGE DE FORMATIONS ROCHEUSES SIMILAIRES[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6408953  (GOLDMAN WILLIAM A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,32,37,39,41,43,45,46,48 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 15; figures 1,2,4 * * column 20, line 8 - line 45 * * claims 21,41 * [I] 2-31,33-36,38,40,42,44,47;
 [A]US2006074616  (CHEN SHILIN [US]) [A] 1-48 * figure 24; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US2006162968  (DURAIRAJAN BALA [US] ET AL) [A] 1-48 * figures 3,5; claims 1-9 *