Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2794190

EP2794190 - DRIVING-IN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FOSER, Thomas
Rietstrasse 8b
CH-9496 Balzers / LI
02 / PRINZ, Oliver
Oberreutinger Weg 8A
88131 Lindau / DE
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property
Feldkircherstrasse 100
Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date12797830.228.11.2012
[2018/02]
WO2012EP73782
Priority number, dateDE2011108952122.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011089521
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013092137
Date:27.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2794190
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2794190
Date:10.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B21J15/32, B25C1/00, B25B23/04
[2017/32]
Former International [2014/44]B25B23/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINTREIBVORRICHTUNG[2014/44]
English:DRIVING-IN DEVICE[2014/44]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2017Fee for grant paid
27.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.10.2015
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/13]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US4014225  (LEJDEGARD SIXTEN H ET AL) [X] 1-13 * column 7, line 13 - column 9, line 2; figures 3-5,10 *;
 [E]EP2532479  (HILTI AG [LI]) [E] 1-14 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figures 2-4; claims 1,6-11,14 *;
 [X]EP1932623  (KWANTEX RES INC [TW]) [X] 1,2,4,6-14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figures 3-5,7,8 *;
 [A]EP0749808  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102004025752  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figure - *