Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790961

EP2790961 - DEVICE FOR TAILOR MADE ADAPTING AND REDUCTION OF THE REAR DISPLACEMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT IN CASE OF A REAR IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/43]DEVICE FOR SELECTIVELY MONITORING AND REDUCING THE BACKWARD DISPLACEMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT IN THE EVENT OF AN ACCIDENT
[2018/22]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adient Luxembourg Holding S.à r.l.
35F, Avenue John F. Kennedy
1855 Luxembourg / LU
[2018/12]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
Adient Luxembourg Holding S.à r.l.
6, rue Eugène Ruppert
2453 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Johnson Controls Metals and Mechanisms GmbH & Co. KG
Merscheider Strasse 167
42699 Solingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ECKHOFF, Sascha
Neukirchener Straße 15d
42799 Leichlingen / DE
02 / KAESTNER, Thomas
Geranienweg 5
42699 Solingen / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Loock, Jan Pieter , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/38]Loock, Jan Pieter , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2014/43]Kutzenberger, Helga , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12797848.429.11.2012
[2018/38]
WO2012EP73934
Priority number, dateDE2011105657216.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011056572
DE20121010427716.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012104277
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087415
Date:20.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790961
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790961
Date:19.09.2018
Language:DE
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/42
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEZIELTEN KONTROLLE UND REDUZIERUNG DER RÜCKVERLAGERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGSITZES BEI EINEM HECKAUFPRALL[2018/22]
English:DEVICE FOR TAILOR MADE ADAPTING AND REDUCTION OF THE REAR DISPLACEMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT IN CASE OF A REAR IMPACT[2018/22]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR ADAPTER ET RÉDUIRE LE DÉPLACEMENT EN ARRIÈRE D'UN SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE EN CAS DE CHOC ARRIÈRE[2018/22]
Former [2014/43]VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEZIELTEN KONTROLLE UND REDUZIERUNG DER RÜCKVERLAGERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGSITZES BEI EINEM UNFALL
Former [2014/43]DEVICE FOR SELECTIVELY MONITORING AND REDUCING THE BACKWARD DISPLACEMENT OF A VEHICLE SEAT IN THE EVENT OF AN ACCIDENT
Former [2014/43]DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LE CONTRÔLE SPÉCIFIQUE ET LA RÉDUCTION DU DÉPLACEMENT EN RETOUR D'UN SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE, LORS D'UN ACCIDENT
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
28.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2018Fee for grant paid
10.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2018
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU29.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
LU29.11.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2279899  (DELTA KOGYO CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0048]; figures 1,3 * [I] 5,7,8;
 [X]US6276650  (KOJIMA YASUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 33; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [XI]US6176543  (NAWATA KATSUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7-10 * column 6, lines 42-55; figure 3 * [I] 5;
 [XI]JP2009208737  (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 3,4,7-10;
 [I]JP2007320385  (SHIROKI CORP) [I] 1,2,7-10 * abstract *;
 [I]DE102007039862  (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0058] - [0070]; figures 5, 6a, 6b,6c *;
 [A]FR2920358  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]; BROSE FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 3 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE202007009795U  (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 4 * figures 5,7B,8B, 9B, 10-14 *