Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2785181 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2785181



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1149
21.06.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 16
29.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 20
10.06.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.03.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.03.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 198
15.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.10.2015 Description Search / examination 6
16.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.10.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.06.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.05.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.05.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
30.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 19
30.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.08.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 19
27.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 25
27.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
25.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
11.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
26.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 144
06.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 208
06.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 206
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
30.11.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
30.11.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 18
30.11.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 187