Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2785181


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
23.06.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
15.07.2016 (Expected) grant published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.03.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.01.2016 Change - classification published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
29.01.2016 Change - classification published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
10.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.06.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.06.2015 First examination report
31.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
12.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2014 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication