Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785181

EP2785181 - 2-(SUBSTITUTED-PHENYL)-CYCLOPENTANE-1,3-DIONE COMPOUNDS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Limited
European Regional Centre
Priestley Road
Surrey Research Park
Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YH / GB
For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
[2016/33]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Syngenta Limited
European Regional Centre Priestley Road Surrey Research Park
Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YH / GB
For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / AVERY, Alaric James
Syngenta Limited
Jealott's Hill, International Research Center
Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB
02 / PHADTE, Mangala Mahadev
Syngenta Biosciences Pvt. Limited
Santa Monica Works
Corlim, Ilhas Goa 403 110 / IN
03 / SCUTT, James Nicholas
Syngenta Limited
Jealott's Hill, International Research Center
Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB
04 / TAYLOR, John Benjamin
Syngenta Limited
Jealott's Hill, International Research Center
Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB
05 / VINER, Russell Colin
Syngenta Limited
Jealott's Hill, International Research Center
Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB
06 / WAILES, Jeffrey Steven
Syngenta Limited
Jealott's Hill, International Research Center
Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
WRO B8-Z1-30
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/33]Syngenta International AG
WRO B8-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2014/41]Syngenta International AG
WRO-1008.Z1.26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date12797857.530.11.2012
[2016/33]
WO2012EP74172
Priority number, dateIN2011DEL344830.11.2011         Original published format: IN DE34482011
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079708
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785181
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785181
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A01N35/06, A01N43/12, A01N43/14, A01N43/16, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, C07C49/683, C07C49/747, C07D213/50, C07D213/85, C07D215/227, C07D231/12, C07D261/20, C07D309/06, C07D493/08
[2016/09]
Former International [2014/41]A01N43/14, C07D309/06, C07D215/227, C07C49/747
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBA30.06.2014
ME30.06.2014
TitleGerman:2-(SUBSTITUIERTE-PHENYL)-CYCLOPENTAN-1,3-DION-VERBINDUNGEN UND DERIVATE DAVON[2014/41]
English:2-(SUBSTITUTED-PHENYL)-CYCLOPENTANE-1,3-DIONE COMPOUNDS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF[2014/41]
French:COMPOSÉS DE 2-(PHÉNYL SUBSTITUÉ)-CYCLOPENTANE-1,3-DIONES ET LEURS DÉRIVÉS[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2016Fee for grant paid
29.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2015
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]CY17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
MT30.11.2016
Former [2018/31]CY17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
IE30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/32]EE17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/21]FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010069834  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]; SYNGENTA LTD [GB]; TAYLOR JOHN BENJAM) [A] 1-46 * page 84, compound T65 *;
 [A]WO2010000773  (SYNGENTA LTD [GB]; JEANMART STEPHANE ANDRE MARIE [GB]; VINER RUSSELL [) [A] 1-46 * page 114, compound 1.042 *;
 [A]WO2009019005  (SYNGENTA LTD [GB]; TYTE MELLONEY [GB]; MATHEWS CHRISTOPHER JOHN [GB];) [A] 1-46 * page 139, Table 35 & page 110 *