EP2783462 - AN ACTUATOR HAVING A MULTIPHASE MOTOR, AND A METHOD OF CONTROLLING SUCH AN ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARQUES, Frédéric SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
AUBRON, Matthieu SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 03 /
PIATON, Jérôme SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 04 /
MERCIER, Guillaume SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 05 /
PERCHERON, Guillaume SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 06 /
PRINCAY, Gaëtan SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 5 rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12798215.5 | 21.11.2012 | [2016/16] | WO2012EP73267 | Priority number, date | US201161562841P | 22.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161562841 P | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013076161 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2783462 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2783462 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02P25/22, H02K11/00, H02K16/00, H02P3/04 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H02P25/22 (EP,US);
H02P6/12 (US);
H02K7/102 (US);
H02P3/04 (EP,US);
H02P31/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STELLGLIED MIT EINEM MEHRPHASIGEN MOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SOLCHEN STELLGLIEDS | [2014/40] | English: | AN ACTUATOR HAVING A MULTIPHASE MOTOR, AND A METHOD OF CONTROLLING SUCH AN ACTUATOR | [2014/40] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DOTÉ D'UN MOTEUR MULTIPHASÉ ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER CET ACTIONNEUR | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 06.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2012 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | IE | 21.11.2016 | MT | 21.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
MT | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
MT | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002057070 (THOMSEN JESPER SANDBERG [DK], et al) [Y] 6* paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2009214363 (NOH TAEYOUNG [CN], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0069]; figures 2,4 *; | [XY]CN101667804 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5,6 | Examination | US4739346 |