Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790533

EP2790533 - ANTIFUNGAL FLAVORING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
[2018/14]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KOMITOPOULOU, Evangelia
60 Raymond Crescent
Onslow Village
Guildford Surrey GU27SX / GB
02 / SKIFF, Ronald H.
Firmenich Incorporated
250 Plainsboro Road
Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US
03 / VIVIEN CASTIONI, Nathalie
Firmenich SA
1 route des Jeunes
CH-1211 Geneva 8 / CH
04 / LOU, Long In
Firmenich Incorporated
250 Plainsboro Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/14]
Former [2014/43]Carina, Riccardo Filippo
FIRMENICH SA
Legal Dept., IP Group
Route des Jeunes, 1
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
Application number, filing date12798244.526.11.2012
[2018/14]
WO2012EP73594
Priority number, dateUS201161569832P13.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161569832 P
US201161569838P13.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161569838 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013087401
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790533
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790533
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23L2/44, A23L3/349, A23L3/3508, A23L3/3544, A23L27/10, A23L27/20
[2017/49]
Former International [2014/43]A23L1/221, A23L1/226, A23L2/44, A23L3/349, A23L3/3508, A23L3/3544
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNGIZIDE AROMASTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2014/43]
English:ANTIFUNGAL FLAVORING COMPOSITIONS[2014/43]
French:COMPOSITIONS AROMATISANTES ANTIFONGIQUES[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
11.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2018Fee for grant paid
20.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2016
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU26.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/34]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
LU26.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US4011346  (ERNST THOMAS J) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,16-19,21-23 * claims 3,11 *;
 [X]US5320772  (TRICCA R EUGENE [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,16-19,21-23 * column 3, line 37 - line 49 *;
 [X]US5424081  (OWUSU-ANSAH YAW J [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,16-19,21-23 * claim 10 *;
 [X]WO9611581  (REDDY MALIREDDY S [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,16-19,21-23 * claim 28 *;
 [X]US2008152759  (HONG YEONG-CHING ALBERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,14,16-19,21-23 * paragraph [0021]; claims 3,4,12,13,17 *;
 [AP]WO2012107252  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]; BARRA JEROME [CH]; KOMITOPOULOU EVANGELIA [GB];) [AP] 1-23 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 10 * * examples 1-4 *;
 [A]US2009324515  (BARRA JEROME [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]WO2005079573  (GIVAUDAN SA [CH]; NATSCH ANDREAS [CH]; MCGEE THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 21 *;
 [A]US2007269563  (MIXON STEPHEN P [US] ET AL) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0085] , [0089]; table 1 *;
 [A]EP2332514  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0017] , [0066] *;
 [A]JP2006290872  ;
 [A]  - FABRIZIO CARTAA ET AL, "Carbonic anhydrase inhibitors. Inhibition of the [beta]-class enzymes from the fungal pathogens Candida albicans and Cryptococcus neoformans with branched aliphatic/aromatic carboxylates and their derivatives", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2011.02.057, ISSN 0960-894X, (20110415), pages 2521 - 2526, (20110217), XP002680016 [A] 1-23 * Compound No 6; page 2522; table 1 * * page 2524, paragraph (iii) - paragraph (iv) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BMCL.2011.02.057
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 79, Database accession no. 2006-774178, XP002692977 & JP2006290872 A 20061026 (UNIV HIROSHIMA) [A] 1-23 * abstract *
 [A]  - AJAIYEOBA E O ET AL, "ESSENTIAL OIL CONSTITUENTS OF AFRAMOMUM MELEGUETA (ROSCOE) K. SCHUM. SEEDS (ALLIGATOR PEPPER) FROM NIGERIA", FLAVOUR AND FRAGRANCE JOURNAL, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, GB, (19990301), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1099-1026(199903/04)14:2<109::AID-FFJ775>3.0.CO;2-M, ISSN 0882-5734, pages 109 - 111, XP008054385 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1026(199903/04)14:2<109::AID-FFJ775>3.0.CO;2-M
by applicantWO2009133272
 WO2005012210
 WO0025606
 WO0117372
 US4610890
 US4707367