Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785592

EP2785592 - ON BOARD INERT GAS GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Limited
P.O. Box 554 Abbey Park Southampton Road Titchfield Fareham
Hampshire PO14 9ED / GB
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MASSEY, Alan Ernest
18 Summerfields
Locksheath
Southampton, Hampshire SO316 NN / GB
02 / DAS, Alok
Flat No. 104 Building Ruby
Gulmohar Orchids
Kharadi
Pune 411014 / IN
03 / JOSHI, Mahesh Prabhakar
Flat No. 104
"Chintamani" Building
"Prasun Dham"
S. No. 32, Opposite to Aditya Birla Hospital, Thergaon
Pune 411033 / IN
04 / MAHALTATKAR, Kartikeya Krishnoji
Gera Emerald City-Building-F, Apt. G02
Next to EON Tech Park
Kharadi
Pune 411014 / IN
 [2017/31]
Former [2014/41]01 / MASSEY, Alan Ernest
18 Summerfields
Locksheath
Southampton Hampshire SO316 NN / GB
02 / DAS, Alok
Flat No. 104 Building Ruby
Gulmohar Orchids
Kharadi
Pune 411014 / IN
03 / JOSHI, Mahesh Prabhakar
Flat No. 104
"Chintamani" Building
"Prasun Dham"
S. No. 32, Opposite to Aditya Birla Hospital, Thergaon
Pune 411033 / IN
04 / MAHALTATKAR, Kartikeya Krishnoji
Gera Emerald City-Building-F Apt. G02
Next to EON Tech Park
Kharadi
Pune 411014 / IN
Representative(s)Eaton IP Group EMEA
c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH
Route de la Longeraie 7
1110 Morges / CH
[2017/31]
Former [2014/41]Eaton IP Group EMEA
c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH
Route de la Longeraie 7
1110 Morges / CH
Application number, filing date12798247.827.11.2012
[2017/31]
WO2012EP73656
Priority number, dateIN2011DEL341529.11.2011         Original published format: IN 3415DE2011
GB2012000189103.02.2012         Original published format: GB 201201891
[2017/06]
Former [2014/41]IN2011DEL341529.11.2011
GB2012000189103.02.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079454
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785592
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785592
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64D37/32, B64D13/06, B01D51/00
[2017/01]
Former International [2014/41]B64D37/32, B64D13/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BORDEIGENES INERTGASERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM[2014/41]
English:ON BOARD INERT GAS GENERATION SYSTEM[2014/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION DE GAZ INERTE EMBARQUÉ[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2014National basic fee paid 
27.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
28.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2017Fee for grant paid
20.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2016
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IE27.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IE27.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
MT27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
LU27.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/33]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2005247197  (SNOW DONALD R JR [US]) [X] 1,3-4,6-7 * page 2, column r, paragraph 20 - page 3, column l, paragraph 22; figures 3,4 * [I] 2,5;
 [I]EP2163476  (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [I] 1-7 * column 2, line 18 - line 47; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2005223895  (WONG KENNETH K [US]) [I] 1-7 * page 4, column l, paragraph 25 - page 5, column r, paragraph 35; figures 1-3 *;
 [DI]US2006117956  (SCHWALM GREGORY K [US]) [DI] 1-7 * the whole document *
ExaminationGB737393
 EP0487241
by applicantUS2006117956