Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790664

EP2790664 - ANHYDROUS COSMETIC COMPOSITION APPLICABLE TO THE NAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Lacquers S.A.
Z.I. Scheleck II Route de Dudelange
3225 Bettembourg / LU
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / WIMMER, Eric
6 rue Baldauff
L-1213 Luxembourg / LU
02 / DEROSIER, Frédéric
1a Impasse de la Fontaine de Fer
F-57680 Corny Sur Moselle / FR
03 / IGNACCOLO, Aurélie
5 rue de Hayange
F-57700 Neufchef / FR
04 / DELAS, Christophe
1-3 Grand-Rue
L-3926 Mondercange / LU
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Office Freylinger
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12798325.217.12.2012
[2017/30]
WO2012EP75086
Priority number, dateLU2011009191816.12.2011         Original published format: LU 91918
[2014/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013087624
Date:20.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790664
Date:22.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790664
Date:26.07.2017
Language:FR
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/85, A61Q3/02
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERFREIE KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN AUF NÄGEL[2014/43]
English:ANHYDROUS COSMETIC COMPOSITION APPLICABLE TO THE NAILS[2014/43]
French:COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE ANHYDRE APPLICABLE SUR LES ONGLES[2017/11]
Former [2014/43]COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE ANHYDRE APPLICABLE SUR LES ONGLES
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2017Fee for grant paid
13.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2015
Opposition(s)30.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2012
AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MC26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
IE17.12.2017
LU17.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
MT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
LU17.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SI26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
IT26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
SM26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
EE26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RO26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
SK26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT26.07.2017
CZ26.07.2017
DK26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
LV26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT26.07.2017
ES26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
PL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
BG26.10.2017
NO26.10.2017
GR27.10.2017
IS26.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT26.07.2017
FI26.07.2017
HR26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
RS26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
SE26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI26.07.2017
LT26.07.2017
NL26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT26.07.2017
NO26.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2077139  (INTERNAT LACQUERS S A [LU]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0013] * * claim 1 * * table 1 *;
 [A]EP2353578  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 1-11 * tables 1-4 *
 [Y]  - Martina Heldemann (Inolex), "Colour Cosmetics: Castor oil alternative for lipstick formulas", Cossma, (20110905), Cossma, URL: http://www.cossma.com/en/news/single-view/artikel/colour-cosmetics-castor-oil-alternative-for-lipstick-formulas.html, (20120903), XP002682737 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4302442