Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791883

EP2791883 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent 
16.10.2019New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / KASAHARA, Shunichi
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / KOMORI, Akihiro
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12798420.113.11.2012
WO2012JP07268
Priority number, dateJP2011027319314.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011273193
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013088637
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2791883
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06T11/40, G06T19/00, G06T7/70, G06Q30/02, G06K9/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2014/43]G06Q30/02, G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/43]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM[2014/43]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
08.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2019Date of oral proceedings
14.05.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.09.2019Fee for grant paid
27.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
16.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2008047015  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [XI]  - ANIL K JAIN ED - LI S Z ET AL, Acoustical and Thermal Energy, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF BIOMETRICS; [SPRINGER REFERENCE], SPRINGER, NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 99, (20090827), ISBN 978-0-387-73002-8, XP007921542 [X] 1-3,5,6,14,15,22-25 * Fig. 3 on page 99 * [I] 4
 [XI]  - MAINGUET J ED - LI S Z ET AL, Fingerprint Encryption, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF BIOMETRICS; [SPRINGER REFERENCE], SPRINGER, NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 458 - 465, (20090827), ISBN 978-0-387-73002-8, XP007921546 [X] 1-3,5,6,14,15,22-25 * Point 2.a on the right hand column on page 459, "Conclusion" section on page 464 * [I] 4
 [XI]  - MALTONI D ED - LI S Z ET AL, Fingerprint Reading, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF BIOMETRICS; [SPRINGER REFERENCE], SPRINGER, NEW YORK, US, PAGE(S) 510 - 513, (20090827), ISBN 978-0-387-73002-8, XP007921547 [X] 1-3,5,6,14,15,22-25 * Fig. 2 on page 512 * [I] 4
by applicantJP2010238098