Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783533

EP2783533 - SIGNALING TRAFFIC REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2017/35]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SALVADOR, Omar
1960 Lucent Lane
Naperville, IL 60563-1594 / US
02 / NEUBERGER, Dirk
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
03 / WANG, Jin
1960 Lucent Lane
Naperville, IL 60563-1594 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Wetzel, Emmanuelle , et al
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
Lorenzstraße 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/35]Wetzel, Emmanuelle
Alcatel-Lucent
Intellectual Property Business Group
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/40]2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
Application number, filing date12798518.216.11.2012
[2017/35]
WO2012US65434
Priority number, dateUS20111330366523.11.2011         Original published format: US201113303665
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078079
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783533
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783533
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, H04W48/20, H04W76/06
[2017/19]
Former International [2014/40]H04W36/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG DES SIGNALISIERUNGSVERKEHRS[2017/19]
English:SIGNALING TRAFFIC REDUCTION[2014/40]
French:RÉDUCTION DE TRAFIC DE SIGNALISATION[2017/20]
Former [2014/40]VERKEHRSREDUKTIONSSIGNALISIERUNG
Former [2014/40]RÉDUCTION DE TRAFIC DE SIGNALISATION
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
19.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2017Fee for grant paid
19.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE16.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
BG30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
IE16.11.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
BG30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
LU16.11.2017
MT16.11.2017
BG30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
LU16.11.2017
BG30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/33]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2120479  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0159] * * claims 1-38 *;
 [X]EP2157830  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * claims 1-20 *;
 [X]WO2011085238  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0155] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170] * * claims 1-20 * * figures 3-9 *