Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820380

EP2820380 - MANIPULATION OF USER ATTENTION WITH RESPECT TO A SIMULATED FIELD OF VIEW FOR GEOGRAPHIC NAVIGATION VIA CONSTRAINED FOCUS ON, PERSPECTIVE ATTRACTION TO, AND/OR CORRECTION AND DYNAMIC ADJUSTMENT OF, POINTS OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
Kennedyplein 222
5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL
[2016/25]
Former [2015/43]For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Navteq B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KRAUS, Daniel
970 NE 129th Street
Miami, Florida 33161 / US
02 / LYNCH, James
1421 West Cornelia Avenue
Apt 3
Chicago, Illinois 60657 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12798645.321.11.2012
WO2012EP73160
Priority number, dateUS20121340858929.02.2012         Original published format: US201213408589
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013127475
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820380
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/36, G06Q30/02, G06T19/00, G06T19/20
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:MANIPULATION DER BENUTZERAUFMERKSAMKEIT BEZÜGLICH EINES SIMULIERTEN SICHTFELDES ZUR GEOGRAFISCHER NAVIGATION ÜBER EINGESCHRÄNKTE KONZENTRATION UND PERSPEKTIVENLENKUNG AUF BESTIMMTE PUNKTE UND/ODER KORREKTUR UND DYNAMISCHE ANPASSUNG VON BESTIMMTEN PUNKTEN[2015/02]
English:MANIPULATION OF USER ATTENTION WITH RESPECT TO A SIMULATED FIELD OF VIEW FOR GEOGRAPHIC NAVIGATION VIA CONSTRAINED FOCUS ON, PERSPECTIVE ATTRACTION TO, AND/OR CORRECTION AND DYNAMIC ADJUSTMENT OF, POINTS OF INTEREST[2015/02]
French:MANIPULATION DE L'ATTENTION D'UN UTILISATEUR PAR RAPPORT À UN CHAMP DE VISION SIMULÉ POUR UNE NAVIGATION GÉOGRAPHIQUE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE FOCALISATION LIMITÉE SUR, UNE ATTRACTION EN PERSPECTIVE VIS-À-VIS DE, ET/OU UNE CORRECTION ET UN AJUSTEMENT DYNAMIQUE DE, POINTS D'INTÉRÊT[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
30.07.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
27.08.2015Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
10.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XDAYI]US2009153549  (LYNCH JAMES [US], et al) [XD] 1,5,6,13,18,22,23,30,35 * paragraphs [0005] - [0010]; figures 3A,5 * [A] 7-9,11,17,24-26,28,34 [Y] 14-16,31-33 [I] 2-4,10,12,19-21,27,29;
 [A]US2006103674  (HORVITZ ERIC J [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * paragraph [0009] *;
 [Y]WO2009118911  (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 14-16,31-33 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7688229
 US2009153549