Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2792028 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2792028



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 224
25.03.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.01.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
24.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
05.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
05.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Description Search / examination 13
05.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 7
24.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
06.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
17.07.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
16.07.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
16.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
16.07.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 8
16.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
28.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
28.05.2014 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
25.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
20.06.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 17
05.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
05.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
05.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
05.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 11
05.12.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3