Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2792028


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
08.02.2019 (Expected) grant published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
02.02.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.09.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2018 First examination report
05.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
10.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
18.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication