Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2792028 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280062221 EP12798704



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9590340Global Dossier 07.03.2017B2
US2015004853 01.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2012EP74544 05.12.2012
DE102011088793 16.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6146823BGlobal Dossier 14.06.2017B2
JP2015501071 08.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP74544 05.12.2012
DE102011088793 16.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104321937BGlobal Dossier 04.07.2017B
CN104321937 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012EP74544 05.12.2012
DE102011088793 16.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2792028Global Dossier 13.03.2019B1
EP2792028 22.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2012EP74544 05.12.2012
DE102011088793 16.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013087487Global Dossier 17.07.2014A3
WO2013087487 20.06.2013A2
Priority number Date
DE102011088793 16.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102011088793 20.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102011088793 16.12.2011