Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792028

EP2792028 - ELECTRICAL PLUG TYPE CONNECTOR HAVING A MICROSTRUCTURED CONTACT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Germany GmbH
Ampèrestraße 12-14
64625 Bensheim / DE
[2015/35]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics AMP GmbH
Ampèrestrasse 12-14
64625 Bensheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BLUMENSCHEIN, Rudi
Hornbergstrasse 5
73479 Ellwangen / DE
02 / SCHMIDT, Helge
Am Woogbach 33
67346 Speyer / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK
Prinzenstraße 13
80639 München / DE
[2019/11]
Former [2014/43]Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK
Prinzenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date12798704.805.12.2012
[2019/11]
WO2012EP74544
Priority number, dateDE2011108879316.12.2011         Original published format: DE102011088793
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013087487
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2792028
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792028
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/03, B32B15/01
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER MIT EINEM MIKROSTRUKTURIERTEN KONTAKTELEMENT[2014/43]
English:ELECTRICAL PLUG TYPE CONNECTOR HAVING A MICROSTRUCTURED CONTACT ELEMENT[2014/43]
French:CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DE TYPE MÂLE AYANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONTACT MICROSTRUCTURÉ[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2014National basic fee paid 
16.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
08.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2019Fee for grant paid
29.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL13.03.2019
CZ13.03.2019
EE13.03.2019
ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RO13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
SK13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
PT13.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES13.03.2019
FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI13.03.2019
HR13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
LV13.03.2019
NL13.03.2019
RS13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
BG13.06.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
GR14.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
SE13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI13.03.2019
LT13.03.2019
NO13.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2006204741  (REHBEIN PETER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-8,10-12 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * * figure 1 * [A] 9;
 [XA]US2006163047  (REHBEIN PETER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-5,10-12 * claims 7-13 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 6-9;
 [XA]US2006148339  (KASPAR FRANZ [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-5,10-12 * claims 1-25 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0031] * [A] 6-9;
 [XA]US2001055697  (SCHLEICHER KLAUS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,10-12 * claims 1-20 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 4-9;
 [XA]US5766776  (BURESCH ISABELL [DE]) [X] 1-3,10-12 * claims 1-13 * * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 40 * [A] 4-9;
 [XA]US2002096662  (SCHLEICHER KLAUS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,10-12 * claims 1-19 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * [A] 4-9;
 [XA]US2010258651  (TEKORAL REFIK ALP [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,4,10-12 * claims 11-20 * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 2,3,5-9;
 [A]US2006105641  (REHBEIN PETER [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-23 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2004241403  (REHBEIN PETER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claims 9-17 * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]WO2011098256  (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]; BURESCH ISABELL [DE]; STOCK DIETER [DE]; WEIRET) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-10 * * figures 1-3 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]EP2148394  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-14 * * claims 1-13 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0053] *