Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788684

EP2788684 - WATER RESERVOIR FOR A STEAM GENERATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[2016/33]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / WILHELM, Bruce W.
5 Plainfield Street
Enfield, Connecticut 06082 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12798710.506.12.2012
WO2012EP74622
Priority number, dateUS20111331386807.12.2011         Original published format: US201113313868
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083684
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788684
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:F22B37/22, F22B37/78
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:WASSERTANK FÜR EIN DAMPFERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/42]
English:WATER RESERVOIR FOR A STEAM GENERATION SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF[2014/42]
French:RÉSERVOIR D'EAU POUR SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE VAPEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2014National basic fee paid 
04.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2012129195  (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]; BAUVER II WESLEY P [US]) [XP] 1-3,8-11 * paragraphs [0037] - [0051]; figures 3,4 *;
 [XI]GB1191689  (VAPOR CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11-13 * page 2, line 81 - page 4, line 31; figure 1 * [I] 2;
 [X]GB294685  (WILFRED ROTHERY WOOD) [X] 1-3,11,12 * page 2, lines 23-78; figure - *;
 [X]WO2011104328  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; HOFFMANN WALDEMAR [DE]; BECKESCH GUENTHER [DE]; CZIMC) [X] 1-3,11,12 * page 13, line 10 - page 15, line 18; figures 2-4 *;
 [X]CH167902  (GFELLER ERNST WERNER [CH]) [X] 1-3,8-15 * page 3, column r, line 15 - page 4, column l, line 21; figure 3 *;
 [XI]FR678909  (INT COMB ENG CORP) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,14 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 24; figure . * [I] 12,15