Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2890742

EP2890742 - IMPROVED HEAT RESISTANCE IN POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Former [2015/28]For all designated states
SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KULKARNI, Amit, S.
714 Table Rock
Evansville, Indiana 47712 / US
02 / KONDURI, Rama
4501 Woodward Avenue
Apartment 407
Detroit, Michigan 48201 / US
03 / DAGA, Vikram
1Lexan Lane
Mount Vernon, IN 47620 / US
[N/P]
Former [2015/28]01 / KULKARNI, Amit, S.
714 Table Rock
Evansville, Indiana 47712 / US
02 / KONDURI, Rama
4501 Woodward Avenue
Apartment 407
Detroit, Michigan 48201 / US
03 / DAGA, Vikram
648 Silver Lake
Evansville, Indiana 47712 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/28]
Application number, filing date12799026.530.11.2012
WO2012US67258
Priority number, dateUS20121360159731.08.2012         Original published format: US201213601597
[2015/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014035452
Date:06.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2890742
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08L51/00, C08L55/02, C08L25/12
[2015/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/28]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGKEIT IN POLYCARBONATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2015/28]
English:IMPROVED HEAT RESISTANCE IN POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS[2015/28]
French:RÉSISTANCE THERMIQUE AMÉLIORÉE DANS DES COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE[2015/28]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2015National basic fee paid 
20.03.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US4448930  (KRISHNAN SIVARAM [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,33 * column 1, line 20 - column 4, line 14; examples 1-8; table 1 * [A] 8-10,12-24,29-32,34 [I] 6,11,25-28;
 [XAI]WO2011130881  (STYRON LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,17-22,28-30,33,34 * page 5, line 21 - page 8, line 14; examples 1, 2; claims 1, 5; table 1 * [A] 8-10,12,16,31,32 [I] 6,11,13-15,23-27;
 [XAYI]US2006079615  (DERUDDER JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,13-16,33 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0035]; examples 1-10; claims 38, 42; tables 1-3 * [A] 9,11,12,17-21,24,34 [Y] 8,10 [I] 5,6,22,23,25-32;
 [IA]US2012202034  (MORIZUR JEAN-FRANCOIS [US], et al) [I] 1-7,11-13,17-19,25-31,33,34 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0140]; examples 11, 14, 15; table 2 * [A] 8-10,14-16,20-24,32;
 [YA]US2009088504  (CHATTERJEE GAUTAM [IN], et al) [Y] 8,10 * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0120]; figure 5; examples 34, 35; table 8 * [A] 1-7,9,11-34
by applicantUS7786246