Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786183

EP2786183 - SOLAR-CONTROL GLAZING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet 4
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HEVESI, Kadosa
Technovation Center
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Agustsson, Sveinn Otto , et al
AGC Glass Europe S.A.
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Larangé, Françoise
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
Application number, filing date12799100.823.11.2012
WO2012EP73447
Priority number, dateBE2011000069629.11.2011         Original published format: BE 201100696
[2014/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079400
Date:06.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786183
Date:08.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/28, C03C17/36
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VERGLASUNG ALS SONNENSCHUTZ[2014/41]
English:SOLAR-CONTROL GLAZING UNIT[2014/41]
French:VITRAGE DE CONTRÔLE SOLAIRE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
23.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.09.2018Request for further processing filed
27.09.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.10.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.01.2017Request for further processing filed
23.01.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007081227  (HARTIG KLAUS [US]) [X] 1,2,24 * abstract * * tables 1,2 * [I] 3-23,25-29;
 [ID]EP0645352  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [ID] 1-29 * tables 1,2 * * claims 7,8 * * page 4, line 2 - line 5 *;
 [I]US5071206  (HOOD THOMAS G [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 12 * * column 10, line 36 - line 45 *;
 [XP]WO2011147875  (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE], et al) [XP] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011020974  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-29 * table 1 *
by applicantWO2009029466
 EP0645352
 WO2010037968
 WO2011EP58540